EP0211322 - Silver recovery system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SILTEC MARKETING INTERNATIONAL LTD. 1484 Hymus Dorval Quebec H9P 1J6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | For all designated states SILTEC MARKETING INTERNATIONAL LTD. 1484 Hymus Dorval Quebec H9P 1J6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brimo, René J. 31 Viger Street Kirkland Quebec H9J 2E6 / CA | 02 /
Lariviere, John 3169-5th Street Chomedy Laval Quebec H7V 1M3 / CA | 03 /
Riedl, James 17111 Emile Nelligan, Apt.9 Pierrefonds Quebec H9J 2V6 / CA | [1987/09] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86110084.0 | 22.07.1986 | [1987/09] | Priority number, date | US19850758504 | 24.07.1985 Original published format: US 758504 | [1987/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0211322 | Date: | 25.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C25C7/06 | [1987/09] | CPC: |
C25C7/06 (EP,US);
C25C1/22 (KR);
C25C1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/09] | Title | German: | Anlage zur Rückgewinnung von Silber | [1987/09] | English: | Silver recovery system | [1987/09] | French: | Dispositif pour la récupération d'argent | [1987/09] | File destroyed: | 21.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 27.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/39] | 31.01.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/35] | 03.03.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1989/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3751355 (MANDROIAN H); | [X]US4302317 (MOCK KARL J); | [A]FR2501240 (GOLDENBERG KORN GARRY [FR]); | [A]GB2101158 (STEVENS WILLIAM JAMES) |