EP0221247 - Asynchronous machine drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBC Brown Boveri AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1987/41] |
Former [1987/20] | For all designated states BBC Aktiengesellschaft Brown, Boveri & Cie. Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zürcher, Urs Allmendstrasse 32 CH-5300 Turgi / CH | [1987/20] | Application number, filing date | 86110270.5 | 25.07.1986 | [1987/20] | Priority number, date | CH19850004201 | 27.09.1985 Original published format: CH 420185 | [1987/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0221247 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0221247 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/628 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
H02P27/06 (EP);
H02P2201/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [1987/20] | Title | German: | Asynchronmaschinenantrieb | [1987/20] | English: | Asynchronous machine drive | [1987/20] | French: | Commande à machine asynchrone | [1987/20] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/46] | 08.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.09.1990 | SE | 26.09.1990 | [2006/14] |
Former [1991/50] | SE | 26.09.1990 | |
FR | 15.02.1991 | ||
Former [1991/27] | SE | 26.09.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP56159990 ; | [Y]DE2244757 ; | [Y]EP0120365 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 42 (E-98)[920], 16. März 1982; & JP-A-56 159 990 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 09-12-1981, & JP56159990 A 00000000 |