EP0210615 - Styrene polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1991 [1991/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishihara, Nobuhide No. 1660, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Kuramoto, Masahiko No. 1218-2, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Uoi, Michitake No. 5336-40, Goi Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [1987/06] | Representative(s) | Türk, Dietmar, et al Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | Türk, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., et al Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 86110324.0 | 26.07.1986 | [1987/06] | Priority number, date | JP19850165881 | 29.07.1985 Original published format: JP 16588185 | JP19860101926 | 06.05.1986 Original published format: JP 10192686 | [1987/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0210615 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0210615 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0210615 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08F12/04, C08F30/02, C08F30/08 | [1987/06] | CPC: |
C08F12/04 (EP);
C08F4/65912 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F12/04, C08F4/6428 (EP);
C08F12/04, C08F4/6592 (EP);
C08F12/04, C08F4/685 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/06] | Title | German: | Styrolpolymere | [1987/06] | English: | Styrene polymers | [1987/06] | French: | Polymères de styrène | [1987/06] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/03] | 21.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB991703 |