Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1991 [1991/12] |
17.02.1990 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.04.1990 [1990/14] |
19.12.1988 | First examination report | |
06.01.1988 | Change - designated states | published on 24.02.1988 [1988/08] |
21.11.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.01.1988 [1988/01] |
21.11.1987 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.01.1988 [1988/01] |