EP0250639 - Method and installation for sludge removal from waters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1991 [1991/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kreyenberg, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Waldseestrasse 31 D-40885 Ratingen / DE | [1988/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 86110467.7 | 29.07.1986 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | DE19863620700 | 20.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3620700 | [1988/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0250639 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0250639 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C02F11/00, B03B9/00, B01D21/00 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
C02F11/00 (EP,US);
B01D17/00 (EP,US);
B01D17/0205 (EP,US);
B01D17/047 (EP,US);
B01D36/04 (EP,US);
B03B9/00 (EP,US);
C02F1/5236 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/08] |
Former [1988/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entschlammen von Gewässern | [1988/01] | English: | Method and installation for sludge removal from waters | [1988/01] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour l'enlèvement de boues provenant des eaux | [1988/01] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1987 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.08.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 18.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FR, GB, LU | 21.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.06.1987 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 22.06.1987 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 22.06.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2538285 (SWAYZE MYRON A); | [A]DE3517931 (SCHAUENBURG MASCH [DE]) | [A] - AUFBEREITUNGS-TECHNIK, Band 23, Nr. 4, April 1982, Seiten 169-172, Wiesbaden, DE; M. BRÄUER: "Modernes Kieswerk im Raum Karlsruhe" | [A] - AUFBEREITUNGS-TECHNIK, Band 27, Nr. 7, Juli 1986, Seiten 396-402, Wiesbaden, DE; W. HASSE et al.: "Ein neues Konzept der Kohleaufbereitung in Kanada - 1000t/h-Wäsche Obed-Marsh in Produktion" | [A] - PORTS AND DREDGING, Nr. 121, 1985, Seiten 14-17, Papendrecht, NL; "Verplaatsbare goudwasinstallatie" | [A] - WATER POLLUTION CONTROL FEDERATION, WASTEWATER TREATMENT PLANT DESIGN, 1977, Seiten 160,183,340, Washington, US; "Waste water treatment plant design" | [A] - F. MEINCK et al.: "Industrie-Abwässer", 4. Auflage, 1968, Seiten 81,82, Gustav Fischer Verlag, Stuttgart, DE |