EP0217050 - Safety window handle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.1992 [1992/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gwinner, Robert Stuttgarter Strasse 60/2 D-7333 Ebersbach/Fils / DE | [1987/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/15] | Representative(s) | Seemann, Norbert W. Brehmstrasse 37 73033 Göppingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | Seemann, Norbert W., Dipl.-Ing. Brehmstrasse 37 D-73033 Göppingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86110474.3 | 29.07.1986 | [1987/15] | Priority number, date | DE19853528029 | 05.08.1985 Original published format: DE 3528029 | [1987/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0217050 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0217050 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G05G1/08, E05B13/00 | [1987/15] | CPC: |
G05G1/082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/15] | Title | German: | Sicherheits-Fenstergriff | [1987/15] | English: | Safety window handle | [1987/15] | French: | Poignée de fenêtre de sécurité | [1987/15] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/30] | 01.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/31] | 28.02.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.10.1989 | 31.07.1991 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE449492 [ ] |