blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0211397

EP0211397 - Silver catalyst, its preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  14.05.1991
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2002Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 02.10.2002  [2002/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/09]For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Boehning, Karl-Heinz, Dr.
Walther-Rathenau-Strasse 32
D-6100 Darmstadt / DE
02 / Mross, Wolf Dieter, Dr.
Anselm-Feuerbach-Strasse 21
D-6700 Frakenthal / DE
03 / Schwarzmann, Matthias, Dr.
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 54
D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE
04 / Becker, Hans-Juergen, Dr.
Bergsteinstrasse 36
D-6730 Neustadt / DE
05 / Plueckhan, Juergen, Dr.
Bensheimer Ring 19 b
D-6710 Frankenthal / DE
06 / Renner, Klaus-Christian, Dr.
Carl-Spitzweg-Strasse 2
D-6710 Frankenthal / DE
[1987/09]
Application number, filing date86110546.830.07.1986
[1987/09]
Priority number, dateDE1985352831307.08.1985         Original published format: DE 3528313
[1987/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0211397
Date:25.02.1987
Language:DE
[1987/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0211397
Date:26.10.1988
Language:DE
[1988/43]
Type: B1 RE Reissue of patent specification
No.:EP0211397
Date:03.02.1989
[1989/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.1986
ClassificationIPC:B01J23/66, B01J35/10, C07D301/10
[1987/09]
CPC:
B01J23/66 (EP,US); C07D301/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [1987/09]
TitleGerman:Silberkatalysator, seine Herstellung und Verwendung[1987/09]
English:Silver catalyst, its preparation and use[1987/09]
French:Catalyseur à base d'argent, sa préparation et son utilisation[1987/09]
Examination procedure16.01.1987Examination requested  [1987/13]
25.01.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.04.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
27.04.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.1988Fee for grant paid
03.08.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.07.1989  18.11.1989  ADMISSIBLE
Hüls Aktiengesellschaft
Patentabteilung/PB 15
D-45764 Marl / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1989/41]
Opponent(s)01  20.07.1989  18.11.1989  ADMISSIBLE
HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Patentabteilung/PB 15
D-45764 Marl / DE
27.07.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/41]
23.11.1989Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.03.1990Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.03.1990Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
09.07.1990Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
04.01.1991Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.1991Reply to a communication from the opposition division
25.01.1991Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
04.02.1991Legal effect of revocation of patent [1991/27]
03.07.1991Deletion: No opposition filed within time limit [1991/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Former [2002/02]CH26.10.1988
LI26.10.1988
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2117183  (SHELL INT RESEARCH);
 [A]FR2253747  (ICI LTD [GB]);
 [A]EP0097935  (HOECHST AG [DE]);
 [AP]EP0161930  (HALCON SD GROUP INC [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.