EP0254764 - Means for selectively joining at least one of a first set of stationary conduits to any one of a second set of stationary conduits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOVER CORPORATION 277 Park Avenue New York N.Y. 10172 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states DOVER CORPORATION 277 Park Avenue New York N.Y. 10172 / US | ||
Former [1988/05] | For all designated states Skibowski, Hubert Hüllenkamp 54 D-2000 Hamburg 73 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Skibowski, Hubert Hüllenkamp 54 D-2000 Hamburg 73 / DE | [1990/30] |
Former [1988/05] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1988/05] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. W. Döring Postfach 30 24 30 D-20308 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86110594.8 | 31.07.1986 | [1988/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0254764 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0254764 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B67D5/60, F16L55/00, F16L37/12 | [1988/05] | CPC: |
B67D7/78 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/05] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum wahlweisen Verbinden mindestens einer ersten stationären Leitung für Strömungsmittel mit einer Vielzahl von zweiten stationären Leitungen | [1988/05] | English: | Means for selectively joining at least one of a first set of stationary conduits to any one of a second set of stationary conduits | [1988/05] | French: | Dispositif pour raccorder sélectivement au moins une des premières conduites stationnaires pour fluides à différentes conduites secondes | [1988/05] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/29] | 16.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1566599 ; | [A]FR1566884 ; | [AD]DE3210558 ; | [E]DE3506221 |