EP0219626 - Film-forming compositions comprising polyglutarimide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.1991 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brunsvold, William R. 22 Clover Hill Rd Poughkeepsie New York 12603 / US | 02 /
Crockatt, Dale M. 29 Warren Street Somers New York 10589 / US | 03 /
Skinner, Michael Patrick 9 Gertrude Place Wappingers Falls New York 12590 / US | [1987/18] | Representative(s) | Klein, Daniel Jacques Henri, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | Klein, Daniel Jacques Henri, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1988/41] | Combeau, Jacques Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1987/18] | Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 W-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 86110658.1 | 01.08.1986 | [1987/18] | Priority number, date | US19850788366 | 17.10.1985 Original published format: US 788366 | [1987/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0219626 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0219626 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/10, G03F7/16, C08L33/24 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
C08J3/091 (EP);
G03F7/0048 (EP);
G03F7/039 (EP);
C08J2379/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/18] | Title | German: | Polyglutarimid enthaltende schichtformende Zusammensetzungen | [1987/18] | English: | Film-forming compositions comprising polyglutarimide | [1987/18] | French: | Compositions formant un film à base de polyglutarimide | [1987/18] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 21.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/42] | 20.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/02] | 07.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0145355 ; | [A]EP0126266 |