EP0213414 - Operation means container in a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iveco Magirus Aktiengesellschaft Schillerstrasse 2 Postfach 27 40 D-89017 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | For all designated states Iveco Magirus Aktiengesellschaft Schillerstrasse 2 Postfach 27 40 D-89017 Ulm / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
May, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. Beyerstrasse 33 D-7900 Ulm / DE | [1987/11] | Representative(s) | Socha, Peter c/o Eberspächer GmbH & Co, Eberspächerstrasse 24 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | Socha, Peter Iveco Magirus AG Postfach 2740 Schillerstrasse 2 D-7900 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 86110667.2 | 01.08.1986 | [1987/11] | Priority number, date | DE19853527700 | 02.08.1985 Original published format: DE 3527700 | [1987/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0213414 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0213414 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/50, F01P11/02, B65D25/08 | [1987/11] | CPC: |
B60S1/50 (EP);
F01P11/029 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/11] | Title | German: | Betriebsmittelbehälter in Kraftfahrzeugen | [1987/11] | English: | Operation means container in a motor vehicle | [1987/11] | French: | Réservoir de moyen de fonctionnement dans des véhicules automobiles | [1987/11] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 27.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3210260 ; | [A]FR2357438 ; | [A]FR1595227 |