Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.1992 [1992/20] |
09.03.1990 | First examination report | |
14.12.1988 | Change - representative | published on 01.02.1989 [1989/05] |
10.08.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.09.1988 [1988/39] |
31.12.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.02.1988 [1988/07] |