Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4615176 | 07.10.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US72768185 | 26.04.1985 | EP86110793 | 05.08.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4621504 | 11.11.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US72768185 | 26.04.1985 | EP86110793 | 05.08.1986 | US82072486 | 21.01.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0255842 | Global Dossier | 17.02.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP86110793 | 05.08.1986 |