EP0214492 - High-frequency feedthrough filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.1992 [1992/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franke, Manfred Stubenrauchstrasse 53 D-1000 Berlin 41 / DE | 02 /
Böttcher, Ralph Karl-Max-Strasse 245 D-1000 Berlin 44 / DE | 03 /
Waizenegger, Dieter Gerdsmeyerweg 8 D-1000 Berlin 42 / DE | [1987/12] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Hans-Ekhardt Robert Bosch GmbH Geschäftsbereich Elektronik Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Forckenbeckstrasse 9-13 D-14199 Berlin / DE | [1987/12] | Application number, filing date | 86111193.8 | 13.08.1986 | [1987/12] | Priority number, date | DE19853531531 | 04.09.1985 Original published format: DE 3531531 | [1987/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0214492 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0214492 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0214492 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H03H1/00 | [1987/12] | CPC: |
H03H1/0007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, SE [1987/12] | Title | German: | Hochfrequenz-Durchführungsfilter | [1987/12] | English: | High-frequency feedthrough filter | [1987/12] | French: | Filtre de traversée à hautes fréquences | [1987/12] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 14.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 11.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59169216 ; | [A]JP60094515 ; | [A]JP60096911 ; | [Y]DE3326629 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [Y]US4173745 (SAUNDERS ROGER A [US]); | [AP]EP0169053 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 23 (E-293) [1746], 30. Januar 1985; & JP-A-59 169 216 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 25-09-1984, & JP59169216 A 00000000 | [ ] - JOURNAL OF ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, Band 18, Nr. 174, Juni 1981, Seiten 51-69, Tokyo, JP; "Spread of semiconductor-applied technology raises need for noise filters" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 244 (E-346) [1967], 30. September 1985; & JP-A-60 094 515 (NIPPON DENSO K.K.) 27-05-1985, & JP60094515 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 248 (E-347) [1971], 4. Oktober 1985; & JP-A-60 096 911 (NIPPON DENSO K.K.) 30-05-1985, & JP60096911 A 00000000 |