EP0222077 - Apparatus for measuring rotation speed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/21] | Method for measuring rotation speed | ||
[1990/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1991 [1991/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELDIX GmbH Postfach 10 56 08 D-69046 Heidelberg / DE | [1987/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baron, Klaus Uwe, Dr. rer.nat. Turnerstrasse 11 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Kiesel, Eberhard, Dipl.-Phys. Friedrichsfelder Strasse 19 D-6803 Edingen / DE | [1987/21] | Representative(s) | Kammer, Arno Goethestrasse 2 68766 Hockenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/21] | Kammer, Arno, Dipl.-Ing. Goethestrasse 2 D-68766 Hockenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 86111253.0 | 14.08.1986 | [1987/21] | Priority number, date | DE19853533695 | 21.09.1985 Original published format: DE 3533695 | [1987/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0222077 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0222077 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/36, G01C19/64 | [1990/46] | CPC: |
G01C19/72 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/21] | G01P3/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/21] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Messung der Drehgeschwindigkeit | [1990/46] | English: | Apparatus for measuring rotation speed | [1990/46] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de la vitesse de rotation | [1990/46] |
Former [1987/21] | Verfahren zur Messung der Drehgeschwindigkeit | ||
Former [1987/21] | Method for measuring rotation speed | ||
Former [1987/21] | Procédé de mesure de la vitesse de rotation | Examination procedure | 29.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 22.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3028821 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [X]EP0113890 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US], et al); | [X]DE3001721 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE2934794 (LICENTIA GMBH, et al); | [AD]EP0123499 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]); | [A]EP0092831 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) |