EP0212622 - Flameproofing synthetic fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1992 [1992/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tashiro, Mikio 2750-1-48, Minamiyoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime-ken / JP | 02 /
Sakashita, Nobuo 2750-1-30, Minamiyoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime-ken / JP | 03 /
Tatsuoka, Yasunori 18-19, Towaen Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | 04 /
Mitamura, Tamio 4-5-15-101, Okamoto Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Kyogo-ken / JP | 05 /
Orii, Kazunori 466-24, Kawahara-cho Kusatsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | [1987/10] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86111460.1 | 19.08.1986 | [1987/10] | Priority number, date | JP19850191375 | 29.08.1985 Original published format: JP 19137585 | [1987/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0212622 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0212622 | Date: | 17.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0212622 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D06M13/295 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
D06M13/292 (EP,US);
D06M15/244 (KR);
D06M13/08 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1987/10] | D06M13/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/10] | Title | German: | Flammfeste synthetische Fasern | [1987/10] | English: | Flameproofing synthetic fiber | [1987/10] | French: | Fibres synthétiques incombustibles | [1987/10] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1986 | Examination requested [1987/10] | 02.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2001125 [ ]; | US3974310 [ ] (MISCHUTIN VLADIMIR); | US4116702 [ ] (ROHRINGER PETER, et al); | US3783016 [ ] (RANDALL D, et al); | DE2454189 [ ]; | DE2646218 [ ] |