EP0213580 - Urethane containing perfluoroalkyl and epichlorhydrine groups, their aqueous dispersion and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1991 [1991/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bathelt, Heinrich, Dr. Beckstrasse 21 D-8262 Altötting / DE | 02 /
Ehrl, Winfried, Dr. Stethaimer Strasse 4 D-8265 Neuötting / DE | 03 /
Wehowsky, Frank, Dr. Talhauser Strasse 27 D-8269 Burgkirchen / DE | 04 /
Kleber, Rolf, Dr. Am Trieb 41 D-6078 Neu-Isenburg / DE | 05 /
Lotz, Werner, Dr. Rossertblick 16 D-6272 Niedernhausen / DE | 06 /
Glenz, Wolfgang Berliner Ring 20 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | 07 /
Herdt, Hubert Vor der Höhe 27 D-6070 Langen / DE | 08 /
Jäckel, Lothar Kettelerstrasse 88 D-6093 Flörsheim am Main / DE | 09 /
Mast, Jan-Hilbert Am Zollhaus 18 D-6257 Hünfelden / DE | 10 /
Hintermeier, Karl, Dr. Hünfelder Strasse 18 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 11 /
Müller, Manfred Untere Schönau 31 D-6460 Gelnhausen / DE | [1987/11] | Application number, filing date | 86111699.4 | 23.08.1986 | [1987/11] | Priority number, date | DE19853530967 | 30.08.1985 Original published format: DE 3530967 | DE19863605844 | 22.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3605844 | [1987/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0213580 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0213580 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0213580 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C271/06, C14C9/00, D06M13/322 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
D06M13/428 (EP,US);
C14C9/00 (EP,US);
B27K2240/70 (EP,US);
B27K3/38 (EP,US);
B27K3/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/11] | C07C125/073, C14C9/00, D06M13/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/11] | Title | German: | Perfluoralkyl- und Epichlorhydrin-Gruppen enthaltende Urethane, diese Urethane enthaltende wässrige Dispersionen und ihre Verwendung | [1987/11] | English: | Urethane containing perfluoroalkyl and epichlorhydrine groups, their aqueous dispersion and their use | [1987/11] | French: | Uréthanes contenant des groupements perfluoralcoyle et épichlorhydrine, leur dispersion aqueuse et leur application | [1987/11] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/19] | 14.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4340749 (PATEL KALYANJI U) |