EP0214561 - Random access memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.06.1992 [1992/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Micro-Computer Engineering Corporation 2-11, Higashida-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Micro-Computer Engineering Corporation 2-11, Higashida-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ariizumi, Shoji c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Segawa, Makoto c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
Mizukami, Shigeto Toshiba-Kirigaoka-Ryo 2-7-10, Kirigaoka Midori-ku Yokoha, ma-shi / JP | [1987/12] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86111908.9 | 28.08.1986 | [1987/12] | Priority number, date | JP19850191591 | 30.08.1985 Original published format: JP 19159185 | JP19850191592 | 30.08.1985 Original published format: JP 19159285 | [1987/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0214561 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0214561 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0214561 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11C5/00 | [1987/12] | CPC: |
G05F3/205 (EP,US);
G11C5/146 (EP,US);
H10B10/18 (US);
H01L27/0218 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/12] | Title | German: | RAM-Speicher | [1987/12] | English: | Random access memory | [1987/12] | French: | Mémoire RAM | [1987/12] | Examination procedure | 25.09.1986 | Examination requested [1987/12] | 09.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0036246 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0121798 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) |