EP0221281 - Device for purging a developer mixture containing a magnetic component from the developer unit of a non-mechanical printing or copying machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neufeld, Manfred, Ing.-grad. Parkstrasse 34 D-8021 Baierbrunn / DE | [1987/20] | Application number, filing date | 86112151.5 | 02.09.1986 | [1987/20] | Priority number, date | DE19853536080 | 09.10.1985 Original published format: DE 3536080 | [1987/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0221281 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0221281 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
G03G15/0844 (EP,US);
G03G21/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/20] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entfernen eines, eine magnetische Komponente enthaltenden Entwicklergemisches aus einer Entwicklerstation eines nichtmechanischen Druck- oder Kopiergerätes | [1987/20] | English: | Device for purging a developer mixture containing a magnetic component from the developer unit of a non-mechanical printing or copying machine | [1987/20] | French: | Dispositif pour purger un mélange de développement comprenant un composant magnétique d'une unité de développement d'une machine à imprimer non mécanique ou d'une machine à copier | [1987/20] | Examination procedure | 26.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/22] | 11.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.11.1988 | NL | 30.11.1988 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 30.11.1988 | |
NL | 30.11.1988 | ||
Former [1989/52] | NL | 30.11.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5786875 ; | [A]JP6098467 ; | [A]US3632019 (HARM JOHN F); | [A]US3930466 (SMITH RICHARD E [US], et al); | [A]US4082061 (FRASER LAWRENCE J); | [A]US4380309 (TAKAHASHI YUJI [JP]); | [A]US4439034 (DANIELS RAYMOND A [US]); | [A]US4459012 (ALLEN JAMES D [US], et al); | [A]GB2150052 (RICOH KK) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 168 (P-139)[1046], 2. September 1982; & JP-A-57 86 875 (RICOH K.K.) 31.05.1982, & JP5786875 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 246 (P-393)[1969], 3. Oktober 1985; & JP-A-60 98 467 (FUJI XEROX K.K.) 1.06.1985, & JP6098467 A 00000000 |