Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] |
03.09.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
09.11.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.12.1989 [1989/52] |
27.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.1989 [1989/46] |
15.10.1988 | (Expected) grant | published on 30.11.1988 [1988/48] |
09.11.1987 | First examination report | |
08.04.1987 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.05.1987 [1987/22] |
28.03.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.05.1987 [1987/20] |