EP0233313 - Two axis electromagnetic actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baasch, Holger J. 1209 19th, Street N.E. Rochester Minnesota 55904 / US | 02 /
Luecke, Francis S. Route 1, Box 192 Byron Minnesota 55920 / US | [1987/35] | Representative(s) | Colas, Alain Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | Colas, Alain Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 86112202.6 | 03.09.1986 | [1987/35] | Priority number, date | US19850793050 | 30.10.1985 Original published format: US 793050 | [1987/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0233313 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0233313 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0233313 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/08, H02K41/035 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
G11B7/093 (EP,US);
G11B7/0932 (EP,US);
H02K41/0354 (EP,US);
H02K2201/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/01] | G11B7/08, H02K41/035 | ||
Former IPC [1987/35] | H02K41/035 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/35] | Title | German: | Zweiachsiger elektromagnetischer Betätiger | [1987/35] | English: | Two axis electromagnetic actuator | [1987/35] | French: | Actionneur électromagnétique à deux axes | [1987/35] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/42] | 09.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.03.1991 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57110069 ; | [Y]FR2212673 (CROUZET SA [FR]); | [A]DE3344262 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]); | [YD]EP0153459 (IBM [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 200 (E-135)[1078], 9th October 1982; & JP-A-57 110 069 (FUJITSU K.K.) 08.07.1982, & JP57110069 A 00000000 |