EP0219664 - Aircraft towing vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.1989 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1989 [1989/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krauss-Maffei Aktiengesellschaft Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2 80997 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | For all designated states Krauss-Maffei Aktiengesellschaft Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2 D-80997 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuller, Reinhard Dr.-Ing. Finsterwalderstrasse 38 D-8000 München 50 / DE | 02 /
Heiser, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Gröbmühlstrasse 8 D-8060 Dachau / DE | [1987/18] | Application number, filing date | 86112223.2 | 04.09.1986 | [1987/18] | Priority number, date | DE19853534044 | 24.09.1985 Original published format: DE 3534044 | [1987/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0219664 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0219664 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B64F1/22, G05D1/02 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
B64F1/227 (EP,US);
B64F1/22 (EP,US);
G05D1/0255 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/18] | Title | German: | Schleppfahrzeug für Flugzeuge | [1987/18] | English: | Aircraft towing vehicle | [1987/18] | French: | Tracteur pour aéronef | [1987/18] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/32] | 04.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4057158 (LISSY IGOR); | [A]EP0053994 (ENSERB ECOLE NAT SUPERIEURE EL [FR]) |