blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0219667

EP0219667 - Fuel injection device for diesel engines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.11.1989
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.1989No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.1990 [1990/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gebrüder Sulzer Aktiengesellschaft
Zürcherstrasse 9
CH-8401 Winterthur / CH
[N/P]
Former [1987/18]For all designated states
GEBRÜDER SULZER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zürcherstrasse 9
CH-8401 Winterthur / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Fuchs, Peter
Sonnenrain (Rustica)
CH-8450 Adlikon / CH
[1987/18]
Representative(s)Sparing Röhl Henseler
Postfach 14 04 43
40074 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/18]Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte
Postfach 14 04 43
D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date86112319.805.09.1986
[1987/18]
Priority number, dateCH1985000449718.10.1985         Original published format: CH 449785
[1987/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0219667
Date:29.04.1987
Language:DE
[1987/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0219667
Date:25.01.1989
Language:DE
[1989/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.1987
ClassificationIPC:F02M45/06, F02M59/36
[1987/18]
CPC:
F02M45/06 (EP); F02M59/361 (EP); F02B3/06 (EP)
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1987/18]
TitleGerman:Brennstoffeinspritzvorrichtung für eine Dieselbrennkraftmaschine[1987/18]
English:Fuel injection device for diesel engines[1987/18]
French:Dispositif d'injection de combustible pour moteurs diesel[1987/18]
Examination procedure16.10.1987Examination requested  [1987/52]
30.03.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.07.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.1988Fee for grant paid
24.10.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.10.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1990/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]CH148854  (SULZER AG [CH]);
 [A]DE2114352  (SULZER AG);
 [A]FR2554173  (RENAULT [FR]);
 [AP]DE3541049  (AVL VERBRENNUNGSKRAFT MESSTECH [AT])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.