EP0218106 - Method and arrangement for controlling a resistance-welding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELPATRONIC AG Industriestrasse 35 8962 Bergdietikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | For all designated states ELPATRONIC AG Baarerstrasse 112 CH-6300 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mettler, Paul Wagenrainstrasse 23 CH-5620 Bremgarten / CH | [1987/16] | Representative(s) | Hotz, Klaus c/o SOUDRONIC AG Industriestrasse 35 Postfach 11 8962 Bergdietikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | Hotz, Klaus, Dipl.-El.-Ing. / ETH c/o SOUDRONIC AG Industriestrasse 35 Postfach 11 CH-8962 Bergdietikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 86112356.0 | 06.09.1986 | [1987/16] | Priority number, date | CH19850003892 | 10.09.1985 Original published format: CH 389285 | [1987/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0218106 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B23K11/24 | [1987/16] | CPC: |
B23K11/26 (EP,US);
B23K11/257 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Regeln einer Widerstandsschweissmaschine | [1987/16] | English: | Method and arrangement for controlling a resistance-welding machine | [1987/16] | French: | Procédé et assemblage pour régler une machine à souder par résistance | [1987/16] | File destroyed: | 21.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 29.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/27] | 15.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 29.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/39] | 27.04.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH591916 [ ] (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH); | DE1006550 [ ]; | DD203840 [ ] (KETTEN U NAGELWERKE BETR D VEB [DD]); | DE2322748 [ ] (DRECHSLER GUIDO) |