EP0218916 - A process to form a sulphide case at the surface of a metal part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/17] | A process and an equipment to form a sulphide case at the surfaces of metal parts | ||
[1991/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.1992 [1992/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhang, Yifei No. 60 ZhuanTaHuTong XiSi Beijing / CN | [1987/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/17] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86112510.2 | 10.09.1986 | [1987/17] | Priority number, date | CN1985106828 | 10.09.1985 Original published format: CN 85106828 | [1987/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0218916 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0218916 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/32 | [1987/17] | CPC: |
C23C8/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufbringen einer Sulfidschicht auf einen metallischen Körper | [1991/52] | English: | A process to form a sulphide case at the surface of a metal part | [1991/52] | French: | Procédé pour former un revêtement de sulfure sur une surface d'objet métallique | [1991/52] |
Former [1987/17] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufbringen einer Sulfidschicht auf metallischen Körper | ||
Former [1987/17] | A process and an equipment to form a sulphide case at the surfaces of metal parts | ||
Former [1987/17] | Procédé et appareil pour former un revêtement de sulfure sur les surfaces d'objets métalliques | Examination procedure | 23.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/38] | 01.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5282683 ; | [A]GB1474358 ; | [A]EP0047456 ; | [A]US4039416 ; | [A]FR1273518 ; | [A]GB1133397 ; | [A]US3472679 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 120, 12th Oktober 1977, page 2834 C 77; & JP-A-52 82 683 (SUWA SEIKOSHA K.K.) 11-07-1977, & JP5282683 A 00000000 | Examination | - Heat Treatment of Metals, Vol. 3, 1983, p. 6-9 | - J. of China Textile Engineering Assoc., vol. 4, No. 2, 1983, p. 5-10 | - Hubei-Mechanics, vol. 4, 1981, p.10-12 |