EP0215442 - Portable video and audio equipment holder for use in an automobile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1991 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weinblatt, Lee S. 797 Winthrop Road Teaneck New Jersey 07666 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | For all designated states Weinblatt, Lee S. 797 Winthrop Road Teaneck New Jersey 07666 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/13] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1987/13] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Marsch Dipl.-Ing. K. Sparing Dipl.-Phys.Dr. W.H. Röhl Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 86112532.6 | 10.09.1986 | [1987/13] | Priority number, date | US19850775674 | 13.09.1985 Original published format: US 775674 | [1987/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0215442 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0215442 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/02 | [1987/13] | CPC: |
B60R11/0235 (EP,US);
B60R11/0211 (EP,US);
B60R11/0229 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0015 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0017 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0096 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/13] | Title | German: | Tragbarer Video- und Audiogerätehalter zum Gebrauch in einem Automobil | [1987/13] | English: | Portable video and audio equipment holder for use in an automobile | [1987/13] | French: | Support mobile pour équipement audio et vidéo destiné à l'utilisation dans une automobile | [1987/13] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/46] | 31.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 08.08.1990 | LI | 08.08.1990 | NL | 08.08.1990 | SE | 08.08.1990 | [2002/23] |
Former [1991/33] | CH | 08.08.1990 | |
LI | 08.08.1990 | ||
NL | 08.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/32] | CH | 08.08.1990 | |
LI | 08.08.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58128942 ; | [A]US2687336 (SMITH GEORGE I, et al); | [A]DE1273570 (NORDMENDE); | [YD]US4383626 (WEINBLATT LEE S [US]); | [Y]EP0084605 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 244 (M-252)[1389], 28th October 1983; & JP-A-58 128 942 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 01-08-1983, & JP58128942 A 00000000 |