|
27.07.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.1994 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.1994 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.1994 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.1994 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.1994 |
F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1994 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.02.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.02.1994 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.1994 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.02.1994 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.02.1994 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.1994 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.1994 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.03.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
02.03.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
04.09.1992 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.08.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.08.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.06.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.06.1992 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1992 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1992 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.06.1992 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.1992 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.1992 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.1992 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1992 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1992 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1991 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.10.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1991 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1991 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.06.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.1991 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.08.1990 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.1990 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.1990 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.1990 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.1990 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.1990 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.1990 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.01.1990 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
10.01.1990 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.1990 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.10.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
27.10.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.07.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.07.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
07.07.1989 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.07.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.03.1988 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.1988 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.1988 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.1987 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of designation fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Invitation to pay designation fees with additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1987 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1987 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.1986 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.1986 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.1986 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.09.1986 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
16.09.1986 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.1986 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.09.1986 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |