blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0260336

EP0260336 - Liquid separator for a set of air or water cooled refrigeration machines for permanent oil return [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  27.07.1994
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 26.12.2007  [2007/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TEKO Gesellschaft für Kältetechnik GmbH
Wächtersbacher Strasse 90
D-60386 Frankfurt / DE
[1988/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Glorer, Erwin
Kinzigstrasse 22
D-6466 Gründau 2 / DE
[1988/12]
Representative(s)Munderich, Paul
Frankfurter Strasse 84
D-63584 Gründau / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/12]Munderich, Paul, Dipl.-Ing.
Frankfurter Strasse 84
D-63584 Gründau / DE
Application number, filing date86112791.816.09.1986
[1988/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0260336
Date:23.03.1988
Language:DE
[1988/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0260336
Date:08.08.1990
Language:DE
[1990/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.1987
ClassificationIPC:F25B43/02
[1990/32]
CPC:
F25B43/006 (EP)
Former IPC [1988/12]F25B43/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1988/20]
Former [1988/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Flüssigkeitsabscheider für einen luft- oder auch wassergekühlten Kältemaschinensatz zur permanenten Ölrückführung[1988/12]
English:Liquid separator for a set of air or water cooled refrigeration machines for permanent oil return[1988/12]
French:Séparateur de liquide pour une série de machines frigorifiques refroidies par de l'air ou de l'eau à renvoi permanent d'huile[1988/12]
Examination procedure17.09.1987Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.12.1987Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, LI, LU, NL, SE
23.09.1988Examination requested  [1988/47]
13.03.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.02.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.1990Fee for grant paid
15.05.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.05.1991   
Linde Aktiengesellschaft, Wiesbaden
Zentrale Patentabteilung
D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
 [1991/28]
11.06.1991Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.07.1991Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.07.1991Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
26.11.1991Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
10.06.1992Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
01.07.1994Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1994/37]
Appeal following opposition13.08.1992Appeal received No.  T0761/92
01.07.1994Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.09.1987AT   M02   Not yet paid
16.09.1987BE   M02   Not yet paid
16.09.1987CH   M02   Not yet paid
16.09.1987LU   M02   Not yet paid
16.09.1987NL   M02   Not yet paid
16.09.1987SE   M02   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR08.08.1990
GB08.08.1990
IT08.08.1990
[2006/14]
Former [1999/42]GB08.08.1990
IT08.08.1990
FR28.12.1990
Former [1991/41]GB08.08.1990
FR28.12.1990
Former [1991/40]FR28.12.1990
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0094590  ;
 [A]DE2602582  ;
 [A]FR2564957  ;
 [A]DE3119440  ;
 [A]DE2540032  ;
 [A]WO8601882  ;
 [A]DE2324680  ;
 [A]GB2164736
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.