Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.1990 [1990/45] |
07.10.1989 | (Expected) grant | published on 23.11.1989 [1989/47] |
23.12.1988 | First examination report | |
24.03.1987 | Publication of search report | published on 13.05.1987 [1987/20] |
14.03.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.04.1987 [1987/18] |
14.03.1987 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.04.1987 [1987/18] |