EP0219692 - Method for producing heat sink and heat sink thus produced [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.1990 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.1990 [1990/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikegame, Hiroo 3-6-10, Kyuden Setagaya-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | 02 /
Nonaka, Shigeo 4-20-303, Yokodai 5-Chome Isogo-Ku Yokohama-Shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP | 03 /
Ito, Takuro A-209, Toshiba Kami Ooka Ryo 2-14-1, Ookubo Konan-Ku Yokohama-Shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP | 04 /
Matsumoto, Toshiaki 2-35-3, Kami Ikebukuro Toshima-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | [1987/18] | Representative(s) | Behn, Klaus Patentanwalt Lindenberg 34 D-82343 Pöcking / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | Behn, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Lindenberg 34 D-82343 Pöcking / DE | Application number, filing date | 86112859.3 | 17.09.1986 | [1987/18] | Priority number, date | JP19850204428 | 18.09.1985 Original published format: JP 20442885 | [1987/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0219692 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0219692 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0219692 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/46 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
H01L23/473 (EP,US);
F28D7/04 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, SE [1987/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Wärmesenke und gemäss diesem Verfahren hergestellte Wärmesenke | [1987/18] | English: | Method for producing heat sink and heat sink thus produced | [1987/18] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un refroidisseur et refroidisseur ainsi fabriqué | [1987/18] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/18] | 29.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3411523 (CKD PRAHA [CS]); | [Y]FR88813E (RADIOTECHNIQUE); | [A]FR2524760 (AUXILEC [FR]); | [A]DE1514679 (SIEMENS AG) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 23, no. 4, September 1980, page 1445, Armonk, N.Y., US; R. G. CHRISTENSEN: "Water-cooled heat transfer plate" |