EP0217244 - Mounting method for a bench seat and auxiliary mounting device therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.11.1989 [1989/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adam Opel Aktiengesellschaft Bahnhofsplatz 1 65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states Adam Opel Aktiengesellschaft Bahnhofsplatz 1 D-65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schrom, Ralf H., Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Dolomitenstrasse 1 D-6090 Rüsselsheim / DE | 02 /
Trutter, Walter Paul Irenenstrasse 21 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1987/15] | Representative(s) | Rosenfeld, Jürgen, et al Adam Opel Ag Patentabteilung Bahnhofsplatz 1 Postfach 17 10 D-6090 Rüsselsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | Rosenfeld, Jürgen, Dipl. Ing., et al Adam Opel Ag Patentabteilung Bahnhofsplatz 1 Postfach 17 10 D-6090 Rüsselsheim / DE | ||
Former [1987/15] | Elbert, Karl, Dipl.-Ing. Adam Opel AG Patentabteilung Bahnhofsplatz 1 Postfach 1560 D-6090 Rüsselsheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 86112948.4 | 19.09.1986 | [1987/15] | Priority number, date | DE19853534432 | 27.09.1985 Original published format: DE 3534432 | [1987/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0217244 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0217244 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/26 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
B62D65/14 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49838 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53696 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/15] | B62D65/00, B60R22/18 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Montieren einer Sitzbank sowie Montagehilfe zu seiner Durchführung | [1987/15] | English: | Mounting method for a bench seat and auxiliary mounting device therefor | [1987/15] | French: | Procédé de montage d'un banc et pièce auxiliaire permettant ce montage | [1987/15] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/48] | 23.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2931552 (OPEL ADAM AG) |