EP0221317 - Plasmid autonomously replicating at high temperatures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1991 [1991/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanraku Incorporated 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1987/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aiba, Shuichi 31, Yamada-nishi 3-chome Suita-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Koizumi, Jun-ichi Morota-shukusha No. 3, 831-1 Nishikawatsu-cho Matsue-shi Shimane-ken / JP | [1987/20] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113091.2 | 23.09.1986 | [1987/20] | Priority number, date | JP19850212222 | 27.09.1985 Original published format: JP 21222285 | [1987/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0221317 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0221317 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/75, // C12N15:68 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
C12N15/68 (EP);
C12N15/75 (EP);
C12N15/90 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/20] | C12N15/00, // (C12N15/00, C12R1:07) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/20] | Title | German: | Bei hohen Temperaturen autonom replizierendes Plasmid | [1987/20] | English: | Plasmid autonomously replicating at high temperatures | [1987/20] | French: | Plasmide répliquant de façon autonome aux températures élevées | [1987/20] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 09.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 03.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0124076 [ ]; | EP0060663 [ ]; | EP0057976 [ ]; | EP0034470 [ ]; | EP0134048 [ ]; | EP0176971 [ ]; | EP0096586 [ ] | [AD] - JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, vol. 149, no. 3 March 1982, (Washington DC) T. IMANAKA et al. "Transformation of Bacillus stearothermophilus with Plasmid DNA and Characterization of Shuttle Vector Plasmids Between Bacillus stearothermophilus and Bacillus subtilis" pages 824-830 |