EP0217284 - Sample-and-hold circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.04.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Micro-Computer Engineering Corporation 2-11, Higashida-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Micro-Computer Engineering Corporation 2-11, Higashida-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iida, Tetsuya c/o Patent Department Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Ikarashi, Takayoshi 2-7-10, Kirigaoka, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | [1987/28] |
Former [1987/15] | 01 /
Iida, Tetsuya c/o Patent Department Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | ||
02 /
Ikarashi, Takayoshi c/o Patent Department Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113146.4 | 24.09.1986 | [1987/15] | Priority number, date | JP19850216689 | 30.09.1985 Original published format: JP 21668985 | [1987/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0217284 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0217284 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11C27/02 | [1987/15] | CPC: |
G11C27/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/15] | Title | German: | Abtast- und Halteschaltung | [1987/15] | English: | Sample-and-hold circuit | [1987/15] | French: | Circuit d'échantillonnage et de maintien | [1987/15] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/15] | 14.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1991/23] | 31.01.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/23] | Appeal following examination | 26.04.1990 | Appeal received No. T0436/90 | 15.05.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 31.01.1991 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 31.01.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.02.1991 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4365204 (HAQUE YUSUF A) | [Y] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. SC-18, no. 6, December 1983, pages 716-722, IEEE, New York, US; R.J. VAN DE PLASSCHE et al.: "A monolithic high-speed sample-and-hold amplifier for digital audio" | [Y] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. SC-12, no. 6, December 1977, pages 592-599, IEEE, New York, US; J.T. CAVES et al.: "Sampled analog filtering using switched capacitors as resistor equivanlents" | [Y] - IEEE INTERNATIONAL SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, San Francisco, 22nd-24th February 1984, vol. 27, conf. 31, pages 120,121, IEEE, New York, US; M. SATO et al.: "A CMOS CCD video delay line" | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. SC-12, no. 6, December 1977, pages 600-608, IEEE, New York, US; B.J. HOSTICKA et al.: "MOS sampled data recursive filters using switched capacitor integrators" | [A] - THE ELECTONIC ENGINEER, vol. 26, no. 12, December 1967, pages 60-64; M. BURD et al.: "High performance sample and holds" | [A] - IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS PROCEEDINGS, Houston, 28th-30th April 1980, vol. 3, pages 1056-1060, IEEE, New York, US; P.E. ALLEN et al.: "MOS sampled-data amplifiers" |