EP0261270 - Composition for staining material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.1992 [1992/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. No. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1988/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Shigeyoshi c/o Asahi Glass Company Ltd. No.1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Manabe, Tsuneo 3-16-1-302, Sugita Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Yanagisawa, Ichiro 543, Sanmai-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1988/13] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113195.1 | 25.09.1986 | [1988/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0261270 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0261270 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/06, C03C3/17 | [1988/13] | CPC: |
C03C3/17 (EP,US);
A61K6/16 (EP,US);
A61K6/77 (EP,US);
A61K6/78 (EP,US);
A61K6/838 (EP,US);
A61K6/864 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/13] | Title | German: | Färbende Zusammensetzung | [1988/13] | English: | Composition for staining material | [1988/13] | French: | Composition colorante | [1988/13] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 02.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 13.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP60178802 ; | [A]FR2548658 (MITSUBISHI MINING & CEMENT CO [JP]); | [A]EP0175265 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 23 (C-325)[2080], 29th January 1986; & JP-A-60 178 802 (KIYUUSHIYUU TAIKA RENGA K.K.) 12-09-1985, & JP60178802 A 00000000 |