EP0225444 - Process for the control of an electromagnet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/07] | For all designated states AUDI AG D-85045 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
Former [1987/25] | For all designated states Meyer, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr. Isestrasse 119 D-2000 Hamburg 13 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1987/25] | Representative(s) | le Vrang, Klaus AUDI AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | le Vrang, Klaus AUDI AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
Former [1990/07] | Le Vrang, Klaus AUDI AG, Patentabteilung D-85045 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
Former [1987/25] | Fleck, Thomas, Dr. Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Postfach 32 32 17 D-20117 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113598.6 | 02.10.1986 | [1987/25] | Priority number, date | DE19853543055 | 05.12.1985 Original published format: DE 3543055 | [1987/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0225444 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0225444 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/18, H01H47/32, F01L9/04 | [1987/25] | CPC: |
H01F7/1805 (EP);
F01L9/20 (EP);
H01H47/325 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ansteuern eines Elektromagneten | [1987/25] | English: | Process for the control of an electromagnet | [1987/25] | French: | Procédé de commande d'un électro-aimant | [1987/25] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 23.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2102595 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE2208135 (VOITH GETRIEBE KG); | [A]DE2601799 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]US4123729 (BUETEMEISTER EARL H) |