EP0263192 - Dicyanoethenyl fatty compounds and derivatives thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION (a Delaware corp.) 7900 West 78th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55435 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION (a Delaware corp.) 7900 West 78th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55435 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Virnig, Michael J. 1365 73rd Avenue NE Fridley MN 55432 / US | 02 /
Clark, James P. 40 West Balley Road Naperville, Ill. 60565 / US | [1988/15] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1988/15] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113729.7 | 03.10.1986 | [1988/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0263192 | Date: | 13.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C121/34, C08F22/34, C07C120/00 | [1988/15] | CPC: |
C07C255/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/15] | Title | German: | Dicyanethenyl-Fettverbindungen und deren Derivate | [1988/15] | English: | Dicyanoethenyl fatty compounds and derivatives thereof | [1988/15] | French: | Composés gras dicyanoéthènyliques et leurs dérivés | [1988/15] | File destroyed: | 19.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 08.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/49] | 22.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.05.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0063944 |