EP0218218 - An inputting system and an editing system in an inquiry-and-answer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.12.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Toshiyuki 492, Minosho-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Kuga, Shigeki 3-1-22, Chiyogaoka Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Morishita, Taro 492, Minosho-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi Nara-ken / JP | 04 /
Nakamura, Nobuo 33, Yanagi 3-chome Yamatokoriyama-shi Nara-ken / JP | 05 /
Ohsaki, Mikio 1114-2, Kume-cho Kashihara-shi Nara-ken / JP | [1987/16] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Selting, Günther, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1987/16] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113730.5 | 03.10.1986 | [1987/16] | Priority number, date | JP19850225188 | 07.10.1985 Original published format: JP 22518885 | JP19850225189 | 07.10.1985 Original published format: JP 22518985 | [1987/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0218218 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0218218 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F15/20, G06F15/40 | [1989/45] | CPC: |
G06N5/022 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/16] | G06F9/44, G06F15/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/16] | Title | German: | Eingabe- und Aufbereitungssystem in einem Frage-und-Antwort-System | [1987/16] | English: | An inputting system and an editing system in an inquiry-and-answer system | [1987/16] | French: | Système d'entrée et système d'édition dans un système de question et réponse | [1987/16] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/16] | 05.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/04] | 10.09.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1992 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - INTELLIGENT TUTORING SYSTEMS, 1982, pages 227-282, Academic Press, London, GB; J.S. BROWN et al.: "Pedagogical, natural language and knowledge engineering techniques in SOPHIE I, II and III" | [X] - E.S. SHORTLIFFE: "Computer-based medical consultations: MYCIN", 1976, pages 72-75,208-217, American Elsevier, New York, US |