EP0218231 - Shutter arrangement for a disc cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Maxell Ltd. No 1-1-88, Ushitora Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1987/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koyama, Mitsuyoshi 1468-5, Sanora Furumagi Ishigemachi Yuki-gun Ibaragi-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsushima, Seiichi 2-13-6, Umezono Sakura-mura Niihari-gun Ibaragi-ken / JP | 03 /
Umeda, Jun-ichi 6-9 Nishinodai Yawara-mura Tsukuba-gun Ibaragi-ken / JP | 04 /
Kanazawa, Yasunori 1-4-5, Motoyokoyama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo-to / JP | 05 /
Nakamori, Yoshiyuki 1012-8, Shinishige Ishigemachi Yuki-gun Ibaragi-ken / JP | [1987/16] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Selting, Günther Patentanwälte Von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1987/16] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113850.1 | 07.10.1986 | [1987/16] | Priority number, date | JP19850224509 | 07.10.1985 Original published format: JP 22450985 | [1987/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0218231 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0218231 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/03 | [1987/16] | CPC: |
G11B23/0308 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/16] | Title | German: | Verschluss für Plattenkassette | [1987/16] | English: | Shutter arrangement for a disc cartridge | [1987/16] | French: | Dispositif d'obturation pour cassette à disque | [1987/16] | File destroyed: | 21.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 05.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/48] | 25.10.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5975467 ; | [XP]JP60167158 ; | [X]GB2124012 ; | [X]GB2110462 ; | [XP]EP0174111 ; | [A]FR2529701 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACT OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 188 (P-297)[1625], 29th August 1984; & JP-A-59 75 467 (SONY K.K.) 28-04-1984, & JP5975467 A 00000000 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACT OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 12 (P-421)[2069], 17th January 1986; & JP-A-60 167 158 (CANON K.K.) 30-08-1985, & JP60167158 A 00000000 |