EP0221382 - Method and compositions for the treatment of tumors comprising a calcium channel blocker compound of the dihydropyridine class and a platinum coordination compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF WAYNE STATE UNIVERSITY 5050 Cass Avenue Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF WAYNE STATE UNIVERSITY 5050 Cass Avenue Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honn, Kenneth V. 1889 Stanhope Grosse Pointe Woods, Michigan 48236 / US | 02 /
Taylor, John D. 1408 Joliet Place Detroit, Michigan 48207 / US | 03 /
Onoda, James M. 212 Baker Street No. 203, Royal Oak, Michigan 48067 / US | [1987/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/20] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113897.2 | 07.10.1986 | [1987/20] | Priority number, date | US19850786321 | 10.10.1985 Original published format: US 786321 | [1987/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0221382 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/24, // (A61K33/24, 31:44) | [1987/20] | CPC: |
A61K31/275 (EP,US);
A61K33/243 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K33/24, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/24, A61K31/44 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Zusammensetzungen zur Behandlung von Tumoren mit Gehalt an einer Calcium-Channel-Blocker-Verbindung aus der Klasse der Dihydropyridine und an einer Platin-Koordinationsverbindung | [1987/20] | English: | Method and compositions for the treatment of tumors comprising a calcium channel blocker compound of the dihydropyridine class and a platinum coordination compound | [1987/20] | French: | Méthode et compositions de traitement de tumeurs comprenant un composé bloqueur du calcium-channel de la classe des dihydropyridines et un composé de coordination du platine | [1987/20] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 22.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/26] | 20.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/45] | 10.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1990 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 105, No. 7, August 8, 1986, page 26, Ref. No. 54211z; Columbus, Ohio, US, J.M. ONODA et al.: "Cisplatin and nifedipine: Synergistic cytotoxicity against murine solid tumors and their metastases", & Cancer Lett. (Shannon. Irel.) 1986, 30(2), 181-8Abstract. |