EP0219069 - Light modulator and wave guide device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okazaki, Yoji c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 798 Miyanodai Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Sunagawa, Hiroshi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 798 Miyanodai Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kamiyama, Kozi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 798 Miyanodai Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1987/17] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86114032.5 | 10.10.1986 | [1987/17] | Priority number, date | JP19850226060 | 11.10.1985 Original published format: JP 22606085 | JP19850230290 | 16.10.1985 Original published format: JP 23029085 | [1987/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0219069 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0219069 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0219069 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/295, H04N1/12 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
G02F1/0147 (EP,US);
G02F1/295 (EP,US);
G06K15/1285 (EP,US);
H04N1/12 (EP,US);
H04N1/1275 (EP,US);
G02F2201/302 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/17] | G02F1/29, H04N1/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1987/17] | Title | German: | Lichtmodulator und Wellenleitervorrichtung | [1987/17] | English: | Light modulator and wave guide device | [1987/17] | French: | Modulateur de lumière et dispositif à guide d'ondes | [1987/17] | Examination procedure | 29.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/09] | 11.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59069732 ; | [A]JP58130327 ; | [A]US4039249 (KAMINOW IVAN PAUL, et al); | [A]US4047795 (HUGHES RICHARD SWART, et al); | [A]EP0104634 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 175 (P-294)[1612], 11th August 1984; & JP-A-59 069 732 (TATEISHI DENKI K.K.) 20-04-1984, & JP59069732 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 245 (P-233)[1390], 29th October 1983; & JP-A-58 130 327 (TATEISHI DENKI K.K.) 03-08-1983, & JP58130327 A 00000000 | [A] - OPTICS AND SPECTROSCOPY, vol. 45, no. 5, November 1978, pages 791-792, The Optical Society of America, Washington, DC, US; S.V. ZAITSEV et al.: "Controlled correction of phase distribution of the field along a thin-film optical waveguide with a diffraction grating" | Examination | EP0198380 |