EP0263890 - 1-Phase energized brushless motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1993 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shicoh Engineering Co., Ltd. 9-4, Chuorinkan 4-chome Yamato, Kanagawa 242 / JP | [1988/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiraki, Manabu 4451-182, Shimotsuruma Yamato Kanagawa 242 / JP | 02 /
Miyao, Osami 8-7, Kamitsuruma 8-chome Sagamihara Kanagawa 228 / JP | [1988/16] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/16] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86114145.5 | 13.10.1986 | [1988/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0263890 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0263890 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H02K29/08 | [1988/16] | CPC: |
H02K29/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1988/16] | Title | German: | Bürstenloser Motor mit Einphasenspeisung | [1988/16] | English: | 1-Phase energized brushless motor | [1988/16] | French: | Moteur sans balai à alimentation monophasée | [1988/16] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 11.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/49] | 29.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60141155 ; | [Y]US3891905 ; | [Y]US3840761 ; | [A]FR1516085 ; | [A]US4594524 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 305 (E-363)[2028], 3rd December 1985; & JP-A-60 141 155 (YOSHITERU TAKAHASHI) 26-07-1985, & JP60141155 A 00000000 |