blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0219834

EP0219834 - Portless type master cylinder device with non return valve and restricted passage in parallel between pressure chamber and fluid reservoir [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.1994
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.05.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.07.1994 [1994/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1987/18]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken 471 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sakamoto, Shigeru
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Shirai, Kenji
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Sugimoto, Haruo
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP
04 / Okuyama, Masaaki
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP
[1987/18]
Representative(s)Grams, Klaus Dieter, et al
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/18]Grams, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date86114432.717.10.1986
[1987/18]
Priority number, dateJP1985023279018.10.1985         Original published format: JP 23279085
JP1986002173303.02.1986         Original published format: JP 2173386
[1987/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0219834
Date:29.04.1987
Language:EN
[1987/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0219834
Date:20.07.1988
Language:EN
[1988/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0219834
Date:21.07.1993
Language:EN
[1993/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.1988
ClassificationIPC:B60T11/20, B60T11/16
[1987/18]
CPC:
B60T11/20 (EP,US); B60T11/16 (EP,US); B60T11/232 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1987/18]
TitleGerman:Öffnungsloser Hauptzylinder mit Rückschlagventil und reduziertem Durchlass parallel zwischen Druckkammer und hydraulischem Behälter[1987/18]
English:Portless type master cylinder device with non return valve and restricted passage in parallel between pressure chamber and fluid reservoir[1987/18]
French:Maître cylindre du type sans lumière à soupape de retenue et à passage réduit en parallèle entre chambre de pression et réservoir de fluide[1987/18]
Examination procedure30.06.1988Examination requested  [1988/35]
30.10.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.08.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.03.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.02.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.01.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.1993Fee for grant paid
26.04.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/28]
Request for further processing for:10.08.1990Request for further processing filed
10.08.1990Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.08.1990Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 06
20.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YD]GB2129515  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED);
 [Y]US4208881  (BRADEMEYER DAVID L [US], et al);
 [A]FR1569801  ;
 [A]GB2102517  (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]);
 [AD]JPS5741247  (NIPPON AIR BRAKE CO)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.