EP0219838 - Carbocyclic purine nucleosides, their production and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | [1987/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniyama, Yoshio 6-31, Zuiko 1-chome Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka 533 / JP | 02 /
Marumoto, Ryuji 53-1 Okuikeminami-machi Ashiya Hyogo 659 / JP | [1987/18] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1987/18] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 86114466.5 | 18.10.1986 | [1987/18] | Priority number, date | JP19850236858 | 22.10.1985 Original published format: JP 23685885 | JP19850236859 | 22.10.1985 Original published format: JP 23685985 | JP19860190830 | 13.08.1986 Original published format: JP 19083086 | [1987/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0219838 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0219838 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/30, C07D473/18, C07D233/90, C07D405/04, C07F7/08, A61K31/52 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
C07D473/00 (EP);
C07D233/90 (EP);
C07D405/04 (EP);
C07F7/0838 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/18] | Title | German: | Carbocyclische Purin-Nukleoside, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [1987/18] | English: | Carbocyclic purine nucleosides, their production and use | [1987/18] | French: | Nucléosides de purine carbocycliques, leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1987/18] | File destroyed: | 19.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 14.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/45] | 09.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4543255 ; | [X]US4138562 ; | [Y]EP0042596 ; | [A]US4451478 ; | [A]WO8202202 ; | [A]WO8502845 ; | [E]EP0215759 | [YD] - CHEMICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 11, 1976, pages 2624-2628, Tokyo, JP; R. MARUMOTO et al.: "Synthesis of aristeromycin analogs" | [YD] - THE JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, 1967, pages 852,853, London, GB; T. KISHI et al.: "The structure of aristeromycin" |