EP0220668 - Charged particle beam lithography system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saitou, Norio 1035-1-3-210, Bushi Iruma-shi / JP | 02 /
Okumura, Masahide 16-15, Higashihashimoto-1-chome Sagamihara-shi / JP | 03 /
Komoda, Tsutomu 2196-533, Hirai Hinodemachi Nishitama-gun Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Ooyama, Mitsuo 625-23, Nagabusamachi Hachioji-shi / JP | [1987/19] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/19] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86114612.4 | 22.10.1986 | [1987/19] | Priority number, date | JP19850237498 | 25.10.1985 Original published format: JP 23749885 | [1987/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0220668 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0220668 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0220668 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/317, H01J37/302 | [1987/19] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
H01J37/3177 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/19] | Title | German: | Geladenes Teilchenstrahl-Lithographiesystem | [1987/19] | English: | Charged particle beam lithography system | [1987/19] | French: | Système de lithographie par faisceau de particules chargées | [1987/19] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/19] | 18.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0066404 (CONTROL DATA CORP [US]) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY/B, vol. 3, no. 1, January/February 1985, pages 144-147, American Vacuum Society, Woodbury, N.Y., US; J.R.A. CLEAVER et al.: "A combined electron and ion beam lithography system" | [A] - MICROELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, vol. 2, no. 4, December 1984, pages 259-279, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., North-Holland, NL; B.J.G.M. ROELOFS et al.: "Feasibility of multi-beam electron lithography" |