blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0219861

EP0219861 - Process for manufacturing a metal halide high-pressure discharge lamp having a single pinch, and a lamp manufactured according to this process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.1992
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.09.1992 [1992/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/18]For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
D-81543 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dobrusskin, Alexander
Sudetenstrasse 53
D-8028 Taufkirchen / DE
02 / vom Scheidt, Jürgen, Dr.
Sudetenstrasse 51
D-8028 Taufkirchen / DE
03 / Heider, Jürgen, Dr.
Säbenerstrasse 116
D-8000 München 90 / DE
04 / Wurster, Ewald, Dr.
Oberfeldallee 6a
D-8022 Grünwald / DE
[1987/18]
Application number, filing date86114649.622.10.1986
[1987/18]
Priority number, dateDE1985353788024.10.1985         Original published format: DE 3537880
DE1985353787924.10.1985         Original published format: DE 3537879
[1987/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0219861
Date:29.04.1987
Language:DE
[1987/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0219861
Date:03.05.1989
Language:DE
[1989/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0219861
Date:18.09.1991
Language:DE
[1991/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.1989
ClassificationIPC:H01J9/32, H01J61/36
[1987/18]
CPC:
H01J61/368 (EP,US); H01J9/326 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1987/18]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer einseitig gequetschten Metallhalogenidhochdruckentladungslampe und eine nach diesem Verfahren hergestellte Lampe[1987/18]
English:Process for manufacturing a metal halide high-pressure discharge lamp having a single pinch, and a lamp manufactured according to this process[1987/18]
French:Méthode de fabrication d'une lampe à décharge à haute pression à halogénures de métal à pincement unique et une lampe fabriquée suivant cette méthode[1987/18]
Examination procedure08.06.1989Examination requested  [1989/32]
27.12.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.03.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.1991Fee for grant paid
10.06.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.06.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE1922762  (PHILIPS NV);
 [AD]GB1442497  (THORN ELECTRICAL IND LTD);
 [A]US4512488  (SCHWENK TYRONE D [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.