EP0264482 - Method for contactless testing of integrated circuit packaging boards under atmospheric conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1992 [1992/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beha, Johannes Georg Säntisstrasse 75 CH-8820 Wädenswil / CH | 02 /
Blacha, Armin c/o Business Machines Corp. Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | 03 /
Clauberg, Rolf Hofwiesenstrasse 25 CH-8136 Gattikon / CH | 04 /
Seitz, Hugo K. Breitenstrasse 70 A CH-8832 Wollerau / CH | [1988/17] | Representative(s) | Barth, Carl Otto, et al IBM Corporation Intellectcual Property Department Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | Barth, Carl Otto, et al IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | ||
Former [1988/17] | Möhlen, Wolfgang C., Dipl.-Ing. IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 86114712.2 | 23.10.1986 | [1988/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0264482 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0264482 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/308, G01R31/02 | [1991/51] | CPC: |
G01R31/308 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/17] | G01R31/28, G01R31/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur kontaktfreien Prüfung von Platinen für integrierte Schaltungen unter atmosphärischen Bedingungen | [1988/17] | English: | Method for contactless testing of integrated circuit packaging boards under atmospheric conditions | [1988/17] | French: | Procédé de test sans contact sous conditions atmosphériques pour substrats de circuits intégrés | [1988/17] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 23.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/42] | 27.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60206147 ; | [A]US3436651 (HELMS JOHN D, et al); | [A]DE2309371 (STEREMAT VEB); | [A]EP0005762 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0128107 (OPTROTECH LTD [IL]); | [A]US4507605 (GEISEL DONALD J [US]); | [A]EP0196475 (IBM [US]); | [A]US4618819 (MOUROU GERARD [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 54 (E-385)[2111], 4th March 1986; & JP-A-60 206 147 (TOSHIBA K.K.) 17-10-1985, & JP60206147 A 00000000 |