EP0229244 - Assembly cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LGZ LANDIS & GYR ZUG AG CH-6301 Zug / CH | [1987/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Burg, Peter Grütlistrasse 13 CH-8840 Einsiedeln / CH | [1987/30] | Application number, filing date | 86114940.9 | 28.10.1986 | [1987/30] | Priority number, date | CH19860000138 | 16.01.1986 Original published format: CH 13886 | [1987/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0229244 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0229244 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B23P21/00 | [1987/30] | CPC: |
B23P21/004 (EP);
B23Q7/046 (EP);
B23Q7/1426 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [1987/30] | Title | German: | Montagezelle | [1987/30] | English: | Assembly cell | [1987/30] | French: | Cellule d'assemblage | [1987/30] | File destroyed: | 30.10.1997 | Examination procedure | 02.08.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/12] | 20.10.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.08.1989 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0076231 ; | [A]FR2508362 ; | [A]JPS59110523 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr.234 (M-334)[1671]26. Oktober 1984; JP-A-59 115 131 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 03-07-1984 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 230 (M-333)[1667]23. Oktober 1984; & JP-A-59 110 523 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 26-06-1984 | [AD] - ASSEMBLY AUTOMATION, Mai 1985, Seiten 103-109KEMPSTON; B.LOTTER.: "Flexible assembley lines for precision engineering" | [A] - WERKSTATTSTECHNIK,ZEITSCHRIFT F]R INDUSTRIELLE FERTIGUNG, Band 75, Nr. 1, Januar 1985, Springer-Verlag, Seiten 9-14, W}rzburgDE; B. LOTTER.: "Prim{r-Sekund{r-Montageanalyse als Planungsmethode f}r Montagelinien" |