EP0222252 - Process and device for making photographic silver halide emulsions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.1989 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/21] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmann, Klaus, Dr. Mettlacherstrasse 19 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1987/21] | Application number, filing date | 86114942.5 | 28.10.1986 | [1987/21] | Priority number, date | DE19853539845 | 09.11.1985 Original published format: DE 3539845 | [1987/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0222252 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0222252 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/02 | [1987/21] | CPC: |
G03C1/015 (EP,US);
B01F23/49 (EP,US);
G03C2001/0157 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung fotografischer Silberhalogenidemulsionen | [1987/21] | English: | Process and device for making photographic silver halide emulsions | [1987/21] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour préparer des émulsions photographiques à l'halogénure d'argent | [1987/21] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 28.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/21] | 06.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4334012 (MIGNOT ANDRE G E); | [Y]DE2444159 ; | [A]FR687074 | [AD] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, Nr. 102, Oktober 1972, Seiten 7-9, Nr. 10208, Havant, Hampshire, GB; "Purification and concentration of silver halide emulsions" |