EP0225464 - Composite resist structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.02.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/25] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collini, George John Box 287, RD 7 Hortontown Road Hopewell Junction New York 12533 / US | 02 /
Lopata, Alexander Daniel 51 Virginia Avenue Fishkill New York 12524 / US | [1987/25] | Representative(s) | Klein, Daniel Jacques Henri Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/25] | Klein, Daniel Jacques Henri Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 86114968.0 | 28.10.1986 | [1987/25] | Priority number, date | US19850807362 | 10.12.1985 Original published format: US 807362 | [1987/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0225464 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0225464 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/02 | [1987/25] | CPC: |
G03F7/095 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/25] | Title | German: | Verbundphotoresiststruktur | [1987/25] | English: | Composite resist structures | [1987/25] | French: | Structure de photoréserve multicouche | [1987/25] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 15.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/13] | 09.11.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1992 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH300348 ; | [Y]US4247623 ; | [A]EP0085761 | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 26, no. 3B, August 1983, page 1731, New York, US; C.T. HORNG et al.: "New resist combination for forming a two-layer photoresist lift-off mask" | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 25, no. 8, January 1983, pages 4401-4403, New York, US; L.P. BUSHNELL et al.: "Mixed-resin photoresist system for mid and deep ultraviolet" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 23, no. 3, August 1983, page 1060, New York, US; B.A. JETER et al: "Lift-off structure process" |