EP0233997 - Heat exchanger, particularly for cooling process gas or for heating steam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/36] | Apparatus such as a heat exchanger, particularly for cooling process gas or for heating steam | ||
[1988/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.11.1989 [1989/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 44141 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | For all designated states Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 D-44141 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klein, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Eschenbuschstrasse 4 D-4700 Hamm 1 / DE | 02 /
Herbort, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Unnaer Strasse 65b D-5758 Fröndenberg / DE | [1987/36] | Representative(s) | Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner GbR Postfach 10 46 45 44046 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | Patentanwälte Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner Postfach 10 46 45 D-44046 Dortmund / DE | Application number, filing date | 86115072.0 | 30.10.1986 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | DE19863604288 | 12.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3604288 | [1987/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0233997 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0233997 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02, F22B1/18 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
F22B37/22 (EP);
F22B1/1838 (EP);
F28D2021/0075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/36] | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher, insbesondere zur Kühlung von Prozessgas oder zur Erhitzung von Dampf | [1988/47] | English: | Heat exchanger, particularly for cooling process gas or for heating steam | [1988/47] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur, en particulier pour refroidir un gaz ou pour réchauffer de la vapeur | [1988/47] |
Former [1987/36] | Vorrichtung als Wärmetauscher, insbesondere zur Kühlung von Prozessgas oder zur Erhitzung von Dampf | ||
Former [1987/36] | Apparatus such as a heat exchanger, particularly for cooling process gas or for heating steam | ||
Former [1987/36] | Appareil tel un échangeur de chaleur, en particulier pour refroidir un gaz ou pour réchauffer de la vapeur | Examination procedure | 29.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/40] | 22.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1517732 (FIVES PENHOET); | [A]DE1275071 (BRAUN & CO C F); | [A]FR2435667 (GEN ATOMIC CO [US]) |