EP0231441 - Process and apparatus for the electrostatic separation of salt mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1992 [1992/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KALI + SALZ AG Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 160 D-34119 Kassel / DE | [1987/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balzer, Heinrich, Dr. Siebertsberger Weg 12 D-6432 Heringen / DE | 02 /
Burghardt, Hans Am Dachental 4 D-6431 Hohenroda / DE | 03 /
Diekmann, Ralf August-Rosterg-Strasse 1 D-6432 Heringen / DE | 04 /
Fricke, Günter, Dr. Akazienweg 18 D-6430 Bad Hersfeld / DE | 05 /
Geisler, Iring, Dr. An der Sommerseite 4 a D-6430 Bad Hersfeld / DE | 06 /
Maikranz, Fritz Hauptstrasse 27 D-6431 Hohenroda / DE | 07 /
Neitzel, Ulrich, Dr. Am Donarbrunnen 28 D-3500 Kassel / DE | [1987/33] | Application number, filing date | 86115102.5 | 31.10.1986 | [1987/33] | Priority number, date | DE19863603165 | 03.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3603165 | DE19863603166 | 03.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3603166 | DE19863603167 | 03.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3603167 | [1987/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0231441 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0231441 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0231441 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B03C7/00, C01D3/08 | [1987/33] | CPC: |
C01D3/08 (EP);
B03C7/003 (EP);
B03C7/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur elektrostatischen Trennung von Salzgemengen | [1987/33] | English: | Process and apparatus for the electrostatic separation of salt mixtures | [1987/33] | French: | Procédé et appareil de séparation électrostatique de mélanges de sels | [1987/33] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/33] | 04.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2349542 ; | [X]FR1471934 |